+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2022.
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3986.) Ordered to the Senate.
On March 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17).
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3068.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 24, 2022: SCR 81 Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 2
March 17, 2022: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SCR81 Rubio et al.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (78)
Type:
Primary Sponsor