+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12 p.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2022.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5683.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3556.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 3442.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2022: SCR 78 Durazo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2022: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
April 28, 2022: Consent Calendar SCR78
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 19, 2022: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor