+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2022.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5341.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5955.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3476.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3252.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2022: Special Consent SCR70
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 18, 2022: SCR 70 Caballero Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
August 10, 2022: Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2022: Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 21, 2022: Consent Calendar SCR70
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2022: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor