+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:45 a.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2022.
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On March 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3736.) Ordered to the Senate.
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 24).
On February 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2818.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On January 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2022: SCR 63 Hurtado Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 6
February 24, 2022: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
January 26, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SCR63 Hurtado et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (75)
Type:
Primary Sponsor