+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 86, Statutes of 2021.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2283.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5).
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1094.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 943.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (4)
July 8, 2021: SCR 26 Gonzalez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
July 5, 2021: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
May 13, 2021: Consent Calendar SCR26 Gonzalez et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 27, 2021: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor