+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 36, Statutes of 2021.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1341.) Ordered to the Senate.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29).
- (Corrected May 3).
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 494.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
- (Corrected March 9).
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 6, 2021: SCR 21 Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
April 29, 2021: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 3
March 15, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SCR21 Rubio et al.
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (85)
Type:
Primary Sponsor