+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2021.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1157.) Ordered to the Senate.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 567.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2021: SCR 17 Leyva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
April 15, 2021: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 12
March 22, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SCR17 Leyva et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (86)
Type:
Primary Sponsor