+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2022.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5955.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4656.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
August 18, 2022: SCR 114 Gonzalez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
August 11, 2022: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 5
August 4, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SCR114 Gonzalez et al.
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor