+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 836, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5429.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5893.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
On June 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- June 20 set for first hearing. Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4040.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4001.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 11.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3334.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 30.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- March 16 hearing postponed by committee.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 16.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 25, 2016: Special Consent SB996 Hill
- Yeas: 39
August 18, 2016: SB 996 Hill Senate Third Reading By MULLIN
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 11, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 5
June 20, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 31, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB996 Hill
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 11, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 30, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor