+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5859.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6580.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
On August 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4332.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4970.) (May 7).
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 23 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4606.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 28, 2018: Unfinished Business SB987 Galgiani Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2018: SB 987 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By OBERNOLTE
- Yeas: 80
August 8, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 25, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB987 Galgiani
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 7, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2018: No Votes Recorded:
- Yeas: 13
April 10, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor