+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- June 22 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 4490.) Reconsideration granted.
On May 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 22.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
June 22, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 4
June 22, 2016: [First] hearing set for [06-22-2016]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor