+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 28).
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and JUD.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4382.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4301.) (May 25).
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 22.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4814.) (April 24).
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
- Set for hearing April 17.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 4604.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
June 28, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 27, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB984 Skinner
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 25, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 22, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 10, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor