+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 554, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 4967.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6554.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3687.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3706.) (May 23).
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 5.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3217.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 29, 2014: Unfinished Business SB980 Lieu Concurrence
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
August 27, 2014: SB 980 Lieu Senate Third Reading By GORELL
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 29, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB980 Lieu
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 6
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 12, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 22, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor