+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 11. Page 5225.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 20).
On August 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On June 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 3864.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3768.) (June 18).
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 18.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 9.
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 1.
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 14.
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- March 25 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 25.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2020: Unfinished Business SB973 Jackson et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
August 26, 2020: SB 973 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 18
July 29, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 25, 2020: Senate 3rd Reading SB973 Jackson et al.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
June 18, 2020: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 9, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 14, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor