+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 489, Statutes of 2022.
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 5308.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 6184.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 3).
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 28).
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 3978.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to second reading.
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 9.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3461.) (April 20).
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2022: Unfinished Business SB972 Gonzalez et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
August 24, 2022: SB 972 Gonzalez Senate Third Reading By Carrillo
- Yeas: 63
- Present/NV: 17
August 3, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 26, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB972 Gonzalez et al.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 6
April 20, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor