+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2927.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 18.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
March 18, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor