+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
- From Assembly without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15).
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3836.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3776.) (May 19).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3272.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 30.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
June 15, 2022: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB952 Limón
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 30, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1