+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On September 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4878.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 6410.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6227.)
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (June 24).
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3604.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3705.) (May 23).
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3338.) (April 30).
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- (Corrected April 11.)
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3038.) (April 2).
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 26, 2014: Unfinished Supp 1 SB949 Jackson Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 20, 2014: SB 949 Jackson Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI Amend By WIECKOWSKI Set #1
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 2
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB949 Jackson
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
May 19, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 2, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Education.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor