+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 459, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5546.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 6396.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On June 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 20).
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4939.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4721.) (April 18).
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 21, 2018: Unfinished Business SB946 Lara et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 4
August 20, 2018: SB 946 Lara Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E.
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 7
June 20, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 3, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB946 Lara et al.
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 7
April 18, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1