+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (37)
On September 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 714, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5496.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6022.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
On August 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3842.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3741.) (May 2).
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 25 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3396.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 29, 2016: Special Consent SB944 Committee On T.&H. (Beall)
- Yeas: 39
August 22, 2016: SB 944 T. & H. Senate Third Reading By CHIU
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
June 21, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
June 15, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
May 12, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB944 Committee On T.&H. (Beall)
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
May 2, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 5, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation and Housing
Type:
Primary Sponsor