+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3338.)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
April 30, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor