+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5134.) Ordered to the Senate.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4760.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4676.) (April 16).
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
May 10, 2018: SB 941 Lara Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
May 2, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 23, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SB941 Lara Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor