+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 823, Statutes of 2022.
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5307.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 6197.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On June 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 3888.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3775.) (May 19).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3435.) (April 19).
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3168.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 21.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
August 30, 2022: Unfinished Business SB931 Leyva et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
August 24, 2022: SB 931 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Cooper
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 7
June 22, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 14, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Employment and Retirement]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 24, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB931 Leyva et al.
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 6
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 2, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
March 21, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor