+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 539, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5393.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11).
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3984.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3775.) (May 19).
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3203.) (March 23).
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 23.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
- (Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2022: SB 929 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Wood
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 31, 2022: Unfinished Business SB929 Eggman et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 11, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
June 28, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
May 26, 2022: Special Consent SB929
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 18, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 23, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11