+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 921, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6300.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3596.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3705.) (May 23).
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3310.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 21, 2014: SB 926 Beall Senate Third Reading By HALL
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
June 24, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB926 Beall
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
May 12, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor