+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consideration of Governors veto died on file.
On September 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4916.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 6410.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 14).
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3654.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3705.) (May 23).
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3403.) (May 6).
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 27, 2014: Unfinished Business SB924 Beall Concurrence
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 7
August 25, 2014: SB 924 Beall Senate Third Reading By SKINNER
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 5
August 14, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
June 17, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB924 Beall
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 6
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 19, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
May 6, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor