+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 987, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 4829.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 5778.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 29).
On June 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On May 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 1. Page 3703.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3238.) (March 28).
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 28.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
- (Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
August 15, 2022: Unfinished Business SB922 Wiener et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 7
August 8, 2022: SB 922 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Friedman
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
June 29, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
June 13, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB922 Wiener et al.
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 15
March 28, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2