+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3312.) (April 29).
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor