+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4148.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3999.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3519.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 12.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 28, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
June 2, 2016: Special Consent # SB917 Jackson
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 12, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor