+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 120.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 233.) Ordered to the Senate.
On January 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 14. Page 200.)
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Ordered to second reading.
On January 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 90.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 22. Noes 8. Page 76.)
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On December 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 16.
On December 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
January 28, 2021: SB 91 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By REYES
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
January 28, 2021: Unfinished Business SB91 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 5
January 21, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB91
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor