+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 368, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4685.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6235.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3468.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3441.) (May 12).
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 12.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3342.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 21, 2014: Unfinished Business SB906 Correa Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 9
August 20, 2014: SB 906 Correa Senate Third Reading By PAN
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 14, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
June 10, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
May 15, 2014: Special Consent #14 SB906 Correa
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
May 12, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor