+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (44)
On September 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 359, Statutes of 2022.
On September 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5401.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
On June 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 3882.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3774.) (May 19).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3457.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3238.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 28.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referral to Com. on N.R. & W. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q., ED., and N.R. & W.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2022: SB 905 Caballero Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 17
August 31, 2022: Unfinished Business SB905 Caballero et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
June 20, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
May 24, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB905 Skinner et al.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 2, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 20, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
March 28, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor