+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On September 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 5451.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6238.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5971.)
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 4084.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3999.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3312.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 26, 2016: Unfinished Business SB900 Jackson Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
August 24, 2016: SB 900 Jackson Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2016: SB 900 Jackson Senate Third Reading By A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
June 27, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 1, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB900 Jackson
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 29, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1