+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1653.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Urgency clause adopted.
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 1662.)
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 1649.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2277.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee. (Page 2276.)
On July 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On July 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
- Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2188.)
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 896.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Corrected May 9).
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 3, 2013: From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2013: SB 90 B. & F. R. Third Reading Urgency By SKINNER
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
July 3, 2013: Unfinished Supp 1 SB90 Galgiani Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
May 13, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB90 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor