+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3119.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 25.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor