+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 262, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5934.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On June 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- June 22 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3930.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3774.) (May 19).
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3238.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 28.
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
- (Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
August 18, 2022: SB 895 Laird Senate Third Reading By Stone
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
June 13, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2022: Special Consent SB895
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 18, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 28, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7