+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3417.) (April 6).
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- March 16 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 16.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- March 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 9.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 6, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor