+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 820, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5227.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.M.
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.M.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 3867.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3773.) (May 19).
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 19.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3323.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- March 15 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 15.
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
- (Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2022: Unfinished Business SB892 Hurtado et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
August 23, 2022: SB 892 Hurtado Senate Third Reading By Salas
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
June 27, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB892 Hurtado
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 8
May 19, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 18, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 5, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor