+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- (Vote only).
- Set for hearing May 4.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 27 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3698.) Reconsideration granted.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
April 27, 2016: [First] hearing set for [04-27-2016]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor