+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- March 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 18.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.