+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On August 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 5717.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
On June 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4127.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3998.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3521.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 12.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 4, 2016: SB 882 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 6
June 28, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 2, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB882 Hertzberg
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 25, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 12, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor