+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (35)
On September 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 685, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6061.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6714.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and JUD.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4451.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4298.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- April 30 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4722.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4366.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 13.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 28, 2018: SB 881 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By CHU
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
June 28, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
June 26, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 15
May 31, 2018: Special Consent SB881
- Yeas: 39
May 25, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 7, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
March 13, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1