+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 730, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5421.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6310.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
On August 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4451.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4298.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4816.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 20, 2018: Unfinished Business SB880 Pan Concurrence
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
August 16, 2018: SB 880 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 8, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
June 27, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
May 31, 2018: Special Consent SB880
- Yeas: 39
May 25, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 7, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor