+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6380.)
- Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 6333.)
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 10.) (August 14).
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5975.)
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3138.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9.
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
August 22, 2014: SB 880 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading Amend By SKINNER Set #1
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 3
August 14, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
April 10, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB880 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review
Type:
Primary Sponsor