+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 690, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On August 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4999.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Senate Rule 29.4 suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4999.)
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 6713.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 9.) (August 28).
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On August 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6380.)
- Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6341.)
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 10.) (August 14).
On August 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5975.)
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3137.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9.
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 29, 2014: SB 879 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 7
August 29, 2014: Unfinished Supp 3 SB879 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
August 14, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
April 10, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB879 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review
Type:
Primary Sponsor