+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3520.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 13, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor