+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 712, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On August 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 5426.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 15. Page 6081.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 4.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 4085.) Ordered to the Assembly.
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 4113.) Ordered to the Assembly.
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pan.
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4113.)
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3998.) (May 27).
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 27.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3558.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 25, 2016: Unfinished Business SB877 Pan Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
August 23, 2016: SB 877 Pan Senate Third Reading By BROWN
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
June 28, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB877 Pan
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB877 Pan Reconsider
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 27, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 2, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 13, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2