+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 7, Statutes of 2021.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 306.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 436.) Ordered to the Senate.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On February 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 15. Page 328.)
On January 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 89.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 22. Noes 8. Page 76.)
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On December 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 16.
On December 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2021: SB 87 Caballero Senate Third Reading By TING
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
February 22, 2021: Unfinished Business SB87 Caballero et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB87 Skinner
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 15
+ − Sponsors (84)
Type:
Primary Sponsor