+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On August 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 7. Page 5705.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3663.) Ordered to the Assembly.
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 3663.) Ordered to the Assembly.
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator Roth.
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3663.)
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3394.) (April 5).
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 4, 2016: SB 867 Roth Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
June 14, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB867 Roth
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SB867 Roth Reconsider
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor