+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on the inactive file.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Santiago.
On June 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 38. Noes 22. Page 5396.)
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (June 1).
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 8. Page 3669.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3627.) (May 5).
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 5.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.)
- (Ayes 31. Noes 6.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 16, 2022: SB 866 Wiener Senate Third Reading Amend By WICKS Set #1
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 19
May 12, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB866 Wiener et al.
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 11
May 5, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4